Text: H.R.4517 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/26/1994)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 103th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 4517 Introduced in House (IH)]

103d CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 4517

     To reinstate the emergency unemployment compensation program.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              May 26, 1994

Mr. Klink introduced the following bill; which was referred jointly to 
 the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
     To reinstate the emergency unemployment compensation program.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF PROGRAM.

    (a) General Rule.--Sections 102(f)(1) and 106(a)(2) of the 
Emergency Unemployment Compensation Act of 1991 (Public Law 102-164, as 
amended) are each amended by striking ``February 5, 1994'' and 
inserting ``August 5, 1994''.
    (b) Modification of Final Phaseout.--Paragraph (2) of section 
102(f) of such Act is amended--
            (1) by striking ``February 5, 1994'' and inserting ``August 
        5, 1994'', and
            (2) by striking ``April 30, 1994'' and inserting 
        ``September 30, 1994''.
    (c) Conforming Amendment.--Subsection (e) of section 101 of such 
Act is amended by striking ``February 5, 1994'' each place it appears 
and inserting ``August 5, 1994''.
    (d) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall 
apply to weeks of unemployment beginning after February 5, 1994.

SEC. 2. TREATMENT OF RAILROAD WORKERS.

    (a) General Rule.--
            (1) Paragraphs (1) and (2) of section 501(b) of the 
        Emergency Unemployment Compensation Act of 1991 (Public Law 
        102-164, as amended) are each amended by striking ``February 5, 
        1994'' and inserting ``August 5, 1994''.
            (2) Subsection (a) of section 501 of such Act is amended by 
        striking ``February 1994'' and inserting ``August 5, 1994''.
    (b) Termination of Benefits.--Subsection (e) of section 501 of such 
Act is amended--
            (1) by striking ``February 5, 1994'' and inserting ``August 
        5, 1994'', and
            (2) by striking ``April 30, 1994'' and inserting 
        ``September 30, 1994''.
    (c) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall 
apply to days of unemployment after February 5, 1994.

SEC. 3. EXTENSION FUNDED BY REPEAL OF EXPORT ENHANCEMENT PROGRAM OF 
              DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.

    (a) In General.--Section 301 of the Agricultural Trade Act of 1978 
(7 U.S.C. 5651) is hereby repealed.
    (b) Effective Date.--The amendment made by subsection (a) shall 
apply to fiscal years beginning after the date of the enactment of this 
Act.

                                 <all>