There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Patient Protection Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assure fairness and choice to patients and providers under managed care health benefit plans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/26/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/28/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/28/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/22/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
05/26/1994Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/26/1994Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/26/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/15/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/22/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/24/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/14/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/14/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/19/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/19/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/22/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 07/22/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/02/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/02/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/02/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/02/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/02/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/30/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/26/1994 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations06/22/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/26/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness06/28/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/28/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4527.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4527. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/26/1994)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Protection of Consumer Choice

Title II: Certification of Managed Care Plans and

Utilization Review Programs

Title III: Choice Requirements for Point of Service Plans

Title IV: Choice of Health Plans for Enrollment

Patient Protection Act of 1994 - Title I: Protection of Consumer Choice - Declares that this Act shall not be construed as prohibiting either: (1) an individual from purchasing health care services with his own funds, whether such services are covered within the individual's standard benefit package or from another provider; or (2) an employer from providing benefit coverage in addition to the comprehensive benefit package.

Title II: Certification of Managed Care Plans and Utilization Review Programs - Sets forth a certification scheme for managed care plans and for qualified utilization review programs.

Title III: Choice Requirements for Point of Service Plans - Sets forth choice and payment disclosure requirements for point of service plans.

Title IV: Choice of Health Plans for Enrollment - Requires each health benefit plan sponsor and each voluntary health insurance purchasing cooperative or sponsor to provide a choice among the health plans offered.