Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/15/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/22/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/24/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/14/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/14/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/19/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/19/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/22/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/22/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/02/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/02/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/02/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/02/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/02/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/30/1994