Committees: H.R.4539 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations02/07/1994 Referred to
05/26/1994 Markup by
05/26/1994 Reported original measure H.Rept 103-534 Part 2
H.Rept 103-534
06/09/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-534 Part 2
H.Rept 103-534
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Treasury, Postal Service, and General Government02/10/1994 Referred to
03/24/1994 Hearings by
05/18/1994 Markup by
05/18/1994 Reported by
Senate Appropriations06/16/1994 Referred to
06/16/1994 Markup by
06/16/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-286
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Treasury, Postal Service, General Government06/16/1994 Markup by
06/16/1994 Reported by