There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Persian Gulf War Veterans' Compensation Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a program of compensation and health research for illnesses arising from service in the Armed Forces during the Persian Gulf War.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/08/1994Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/08/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/08/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/09/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/14/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/14/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/14/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/14/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/15/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/16/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/22/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/27/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/27/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/27/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/27/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/27/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/27/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/27/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 08/04/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/04/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/04/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 10/07/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/08/1994 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/1994)

Persian Gulf War Veterans' Compensation Act of 1994 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to: (1) develop and implement a uniform case assessment protocol to ensure thorough assessment, diagnosis, and treatment of all Persian Gulf War (War) veterans suffering from illnesses the origins of which are currently unkown but which may be attributable to service in the Southwest Asia theater of operations during such War; (2) develop case definitions or diagnoses for such illnesses; and (3) implement a comprehensive outreach program, including a newsletter and a toll-free telephone number, to inform War veterans and their families of the medical care and other benefits that may be provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs as a result of service in such War.

Directs the Secretary to pay compensation to a War veteran suffering from a disability resulting from an undiagnosed illness if such disability becomes manifest to a degree of ten percent or more within three years of separation from active military service. Provides exceptions to the payment of such compensation (i.e., when there is a preponderance of evidence to show that the disability was not incurred during such service or occurred after such service). Allows the Secretary to cease such payments after providing specified congressional committees with a scientific report showing that such disabilities are not connected to service in the War.

Directs the Secretary to enter into: (1) an agreement with the Secretary of Defense for access to all clinical data on War veterans who remain on active duty, and to continually compile such data (with a required annual report); and (2) a contract for the conduct of an epidemiological study designed to assess the short- and long-term health consequences of service in such War (with appropriate oversight, a status report, and annual and final reports). Authorizes appropriations for FY 1995 through 2000 for such study.

Authorizes appropriations to the Department for FY 1995 through 1998 for the conduct of research to advance the understanding of health risks and effects of service in the Gulf during such War and the means of treating such health effects.