There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Railroad Safety Authorization Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Railroad Safety Act of 1970, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to authorize appropriations to carry out certain Federal railroad safety laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/06/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2132 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
10/06/1994Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/08/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 0 (Roll no. 379).
08/03/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-655.
06/08/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/07/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/06/1994SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 2132 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
10/06/1994SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2132 amended.
10/06/1994SenateMeasure laid before Senate. (consideration: CR S14425-14426)
10/06/1994SenateSenate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/09/1994SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
08/08/1994-5:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-5:47pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-5:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 0 (Roll no. 379).
08/08/1994-5:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (CR H7168-7169)
08/08/1994-3:19pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
08/08/1994-3:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/08/1994-3:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7137-7139)
08/08/1994-3:12pmHouseMs. Schenk moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/03/1994HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355.
08/03/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-655.
07/19/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/19/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/13/1994HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials
07/13/1994HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials
06/15/1994HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials
06/14/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/08/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
06/08/1994HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4215-4216)
06/08/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/08/1994 Referred to
07/19/1994 Markup by
08/03/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-655
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials06/14/1994 Referred to
06/15/1994 Hearings by
07/13/1994 Markup by
07/13/1994 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation08/09/1994 Referred to
10/06/1994 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/1994)

Federal Railroad Safety Authorization Act of 1994 - Amends the Federal Railroad Safety Act of 1970 to authorize appropriations for FY 1995 through 1998 for railroad research and development and general safety operations.

Amends the Hours of Service Act to authorize railroads, and labor organizations representing railroad employees, to jointly petition the Secretary of Transportation (Secretary) for approval of a waiver of limitations on hours of service with respect to such employees in order to establish one or more pilot projects to demonstrate the possible benefits of implementing alternatives to such limitations, including those concerning maximum on-duty and minimum off-duty periods. Authorizes the Secretary to waive compliance with such limitations for up to two years if it is in the public interest and is consistent with railroad safety.

Requires the Secretary to report biennially (currently, annually) to the President and the Congress on the administration of Federal railroad safety rules and standards.