Committees: H.R.4545 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/08/1994 Referred to
07/19/1994 Markup by
08/03/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-655
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials06/14/1994 Referred to
06/15/1994 Hearings by
07/13/1994 Markup by
07/13/1994 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation08/09/1994 Referred to
10/06/1994 Discharged from