Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/09/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/09/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 06/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/16/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/16/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/16/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/22/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 06/27/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/27/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 06/27/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/27/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 07/20/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 08/08/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/10/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/13/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/19/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/19/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/28/1994