Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/24/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/12/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/12/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/21/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 07/21/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 07/21/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/26/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/1994