Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/10/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/10/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 06/10/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/16/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/18/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/18/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/05/1994