Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/13/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/13/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/13/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/13/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/27/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/27/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/30/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/30/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/14/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/14/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/14/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 07/14/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/14/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/20/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/28/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/28/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 07/28/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 08/05/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/05/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/09/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 08/16/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 08/16/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/16/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 08/16/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/16/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/20/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/20/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/20/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/20/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/13/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/03/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/03/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/1994