Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/16/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/28/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/18/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/18/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/18/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/25/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/25/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/25/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/26/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/22/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/06/1994