Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/16/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/16/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/30/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/30/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/20/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/20/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/20/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/20/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/20/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 07/20/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/20/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/20/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/20/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/20/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 07/20/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/20/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/20/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/20/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/20/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/20/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/20/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 07/20/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/27/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/27/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/27/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/27/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 07/27/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/27/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/28/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/28/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 07/28/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/28/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/28/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/28/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/28/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/28/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/28/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/28/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/28/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/28/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/28/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/28/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/28/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/28/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/28/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew