Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/22/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/28/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/12/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/14/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/14/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/14/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/20/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/20/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/25/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/28/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/05/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/18/1994