There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to make technical corrections to maps relating to the Coastal Barrier Resources System.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/1994Became Public Law No: 103-461.
11/02/1994Signed by President.
10/24/1994Presented to President.
10/07/1994Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H11415)
10/07/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S14660)
10/04/1994Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Baucus with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-398.
07/20/1994Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/12/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/17/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/02/1994Became Public Law No: 103-461.
11/02/1994Signed by President.
10/24/1994HousePresented to President.
10/07/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/1994-10:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/1994-10:12pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H11415)
10/07/1994-10:12pmHouseMrs. Unsoeld asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
10/07/1994SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S14660)
10/04/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 712.
10/04/1994SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Baucus with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-398.
09/27/1994SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/20/1994SenateReferred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works by unanimous consent.
07/20/1994SenateSenate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/1994SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
07/12/1994-12:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/12/1994-12:40pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/12/1994-12:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/12/1994-12:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/12/1994-12:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5473-5475)
07/12/1994-12:30pmHouseMr. Studds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/29/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/29/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/29/1994HouseSubcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources Discharged.
06/20/1994HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
06/20/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/17/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
06/17/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/17/1994 Referred to
06/29/1994 Markup by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources06/20/1994 Referred to
06/29/1994 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/14/1994 Referred to
07/20/1994 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works07/20/1994 Referred to
09/27/1994 Markup by
10/04/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-398

No related bill information was received for H.R.4598.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4598. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/07/1994)

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to make technical corrections to the Coastal Barrier Resources System maps necessary to ensure that: (1) depictions of areas on those maps are consistent with the depictions of areas appearing on other specified maps; and (2) the Coastal Barrier Resources System does not include any area that was part of unit FL-05P.

Authorizes appropriations.