Committees: H.R.4603 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations02/07/1994 Referred to
06/15/1994 Markup by
06/21/1994 Reported original measure H.Rept 103-552
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and Judiciary02/09/1994 Referred to
05/11/1994 Hearings by
06/08/1994 Markup by
06/08/1994 Reported by
Senate Appropriations06/28/1994 Referred to
07/14/1994 Markup by
07/14/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-309
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and the Judiciary07/13/1994 Markup by
07/13/1994 Reported by