There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Multiple Sclerosis Home Treatment Equity Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend Title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for coverage of self-administered Betaseron treatments for Multiple Sclerosis under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/21/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/30/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/21/1994Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/1994Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1261)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/01/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/01/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/12/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/19/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/19/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/19/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/19/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/23/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/23/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/29/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/29/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 09/29/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/29/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/05/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/05/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/05/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/21/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/30/1994 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/21/1994 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/27/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4610.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4610. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/21/1994)

Multiple Sclerosis Home Treatment Equity Act of 1994 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to provide coverage and payment for self-administered betaseron (Interferon beta-1b) for patients with multiple sclerosis.