Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/01/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/01/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/12/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/19/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/19/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/19/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/19/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/23/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/23/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/29/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/29/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/29/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/29/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/05/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/05/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/05/1994