Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/23/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/23/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/23/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/23/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/13/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 07/13/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/13/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/13/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/13/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/13/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/13/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/04/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 08/04/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/04/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 08/20/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/20/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 08/20/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/20/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/20/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/20/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/20/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/20/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/20/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/20/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 08/20/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/05/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/29/1994