There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend until January 1, 1996, the existing suspension of duty on tamoxifen citrate.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/28/1994See H.R.5110.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/28/1993Executive Comment Received from ITC.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/12/1993Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, ITC, USTR.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/06/1993Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/06/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/06/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/19/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/19/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/25/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/25/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/25/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/18/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/18/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/30/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/30/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/30/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/30/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/29/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/04/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/21/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/07/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/19/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 10/21/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/28/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/04/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/04/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/04/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 11/18/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/21/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/21/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/06/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade01/15/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.466. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/1993)

Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to extend, through December 31, 1995, the suspension of duty on tamoxifen citrate.