Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/06/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/06/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/19/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/19/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/25/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/25/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/25/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/18/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/18/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/30/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/30/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/30/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/30/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/29/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/04/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 09/21/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/07/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/19/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 10/21/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/28/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/04/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/04/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/04/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 11/18/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/21/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/21/1993