There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bovine Growth Hormone Milk Labeling and Residue Test Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require labeling for milk and milk products produced from cows which have been treated with synthetic bovine growth hormone, to direct the development of a synthetic bovine growth hormone residue test, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/28/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/22/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/28/1994Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/28/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 06/28/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/28/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/26/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/26/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/28/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/28/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/03/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/04/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 10/04/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/04/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/28/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/22/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4669.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4669. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/1994)

Bovine Growth Hormone Milk Labeling and Residue Test Act - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to impose labeling requirements on milk and milk products intended for human consumption produced from cows treated with synthetic bovine growth hormone (BGH).

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to issue regulations for recordkeeping by persons who sell, purchase, distribute, or use synthetic BGH.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to develop a detection test for synthetic BGH residues in milk.