Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/09/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/09/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/09/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/09/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/02/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/02/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/02/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/17/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/18/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/18/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/22/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/26/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/26/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/26/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/25/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/10/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/10/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/24/1994