Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/29/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/29/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/20/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/21/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/21/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/22/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/02/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/09/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/22/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew