Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 07/13/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 07/13/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/21/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/21/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/21/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/21/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/21/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/21/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/12/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/12/1994