Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 07/13/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 07/13/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/25/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/26/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/01/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/08/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 08/10/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/07/1994