There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Energy Policy and Conservation Act Amendments of 1994

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy Policy and Conservation Act Amendments of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to manage the Strategic Petroleum Reserve more effectively, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/08/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/03/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-663.
07/13/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
08/09/1994SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
08/08/1994-3:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-3:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/08/1994-2:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/08/1994-2:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7133-7136)
08/08/1994-2:58pmHouseMr. Sharp moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/03/1994HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 360.
08/03/1994HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-663.
07/19/1994HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/19/1994HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/13/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/13/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/13/1994 Referred to
07/19/1994 Markup by
08/03/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-663
Senate Energy and Natural Resources08/09/1994 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4752. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/08/1994)

Energy Policy and Conservation Act Amendments Act of 1994 - Amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to repeal the loan guarantee program for the development of underground coal mines.

(Sec. 3) Transfers the Strategic Petroleum Reserve Office from the Federal Energy Administration to the Secretary of Energy (the Secretary). Directs the Secretary to: (1) exercise authority over the Strategic Petroleum Reserve (SPR) through such Office; and (2) transmit biennially to the Congress a Strategic Petroleum Reserve Operating and Readiness Plan.

Repeals the mandate for: (1) an SPR August 12, 1994, Plan (while retaining authority for a one billion barrel Reserve); (2) an Early Storage Reserve; and (3) a minimum fill rate.

Makes the Regional Petroleum Reserve part of the SPR.

Revises SPR operation and maintenance guidelines affecting expansion, drawdown, and distribution plans.

Revises SPR drawdown and distribution guidelines, including: (1) a repeal of the Secretary's allocation authority; and (2) a mandate that the Secretary sell SPR petroleum at public sale to the highest bidder.

Revises: (1) SPR annual reporting requirements; and (2) guidelines governing the obligation of funds from the SPR Petroleum Account. Repeals the mandate for congressional review of contracts for which no implementing legislation is needed.

Extends the authorities relating to the SPR through FY 1999.

(Sec. 4) Repeals general emergency authorities. Revises guidelines governing: (1) international voluntary agreements affecting emergency responses; and (2) antitrust defenses applicable to international voluntary agreements.

Extends the authorization of appropriations for interagency working groups to promote exports of renewable energy and energy efficiency products and services through FY 1999.

Repeals energy emergency preparedness authority.

Extends other emergency energy authorities through FY 1999.

(Sec. 5) Extends authorizations of appropriations through FY 1999 for: (1) State energy conservation programs; and (2) the energy conservation program for schools and hospitals.

Modifies the statutory mandate that the President collect certain petroleum product information.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Renewable Energy and Energy Efficiency Technology Competitiveness Act of 1989 to extend the authorization of appropriations to the period encompassing FY 1996 through 1998.

(Sec. 7) Amends the Elwha River Ecosystem and Fisheries Restoration Act to authorize appropriations directly to the Secretary of the Interior (currently for expenditure through the Assistant Secretary for Fish, Wildlife, and Parks).

(Sec. 8) Amends the Federal Power Act to: (1) extend the deadline for certain eligible solar, wind, waste, or geothermal facilities to submit specified documentation and commence construction; and (2) direct the Secretary of Energy to study and report to the Congress on the current implementation of the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978.