There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Anaktuvuk Pass Land Exchange and Wilderness Redesignation Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the exchange of lands within Gates of the Arctic National Park and Preserve, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/28/1994For Further Action See H.R.4746.
08/04/1994Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
07/14/1994Late Referral to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands (Nov 30, 94).
07/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1453)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/13/1994 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands08/04/1994 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4754. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/13/1994)

Anaktuvuk Pass Land Exchange and Wilderness Redesignation Act of 1994 - Ratifies and confirms the agreement between the United States, the Arctic Slope Regional Corporation, the Nunamiut Corporation, and the city of Anaktuvuk Pass executed on December 17, 1992. Requires the lands acquired by the United States pursuant to such Agreement to be administered by the Secretary of the Interior as part of the Gates of the Arctic National Park and Preserve.

Amends the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act to provide for the addition and the rescission of lands within the Gates of the Arctic Wilderness.