Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/19/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/19/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/20/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/20/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/28/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/28/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/05/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/12/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 08/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/12/1994