Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 07/28/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/28/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/28/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/28/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/28/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/02/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/02/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/02/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/02/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/02/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/02/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/05/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/05/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 08/17/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/17/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/17/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/17/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 08/17/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/17/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/20/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/20/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/20/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/20/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/04/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/04/1994