Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/20/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/20/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/20/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/28/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/28/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/28/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/28/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/10/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/10/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/19/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/03/1994