Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/22/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/26/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/02/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/02/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 08/04/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/04/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/05/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/08/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/09/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/09/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/09/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/10/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/10/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 08/10/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 08/10/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/10/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/10/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 08/11/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/16/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/16/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/20/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/26/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/07/1994