Committees: H.R.4822 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration07/25/1994 Referred to
07/28/1994 Markup by
08/02/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-650 Part 2
House Education and Labor07/25/1994 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor Standards, Occupational Health and Safety08/04/1994 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations08/04/1994 Referred to
House Government Operations07/25/1994 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Information, Justice, Transportation, and Agriculture07/26/1994 Referred to
House Rules07/25/1994 Referred to
07/29/1994 Markup by
08/02/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-650 Part 1
House Judiciary07/25/1994 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights07/28/1994 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs08/12/1994 Referred to
09/20/1994 Markup by
10/03/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-397