Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/27/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/27/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/05/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/05/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/05/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/12/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 08/21/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 08/21/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/12/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/13/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/13/1994