Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 07/26/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 07/26/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/28/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/28/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/28/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/01/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/09/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/12/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/12/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/13/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/20/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/23/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/29/1994