Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/26/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/02/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/03/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/04/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/05/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 08/08/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/09/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 08/11/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/16/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/16/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/18/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/18/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/19/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/20/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/23/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/23/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/23/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/13/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/13/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/21/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/21/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/26/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/26/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/27/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/27/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/04/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/29/1994