Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 08/05/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/19/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/19/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/19/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/19/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 08/19/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/19/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/19/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 08/19/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 08/19/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/19/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/19/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/19/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/12/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/12/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/12/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/12/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/12/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/12/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/12/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/13/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/13/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/13/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/13/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/13/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/13/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/19/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/19/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/19/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 09/19/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/19/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 09/19/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/19/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/19/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/19/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 09/23/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/23/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/23/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/23/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/23/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/28/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/28/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/28/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/28/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/28/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/28/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/28/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/28/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/28/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/28/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/28/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/28/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 09/28/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/28/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/28/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/04/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 10/04/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/07/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/07/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew