Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 08/10/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 08/10/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 08/10/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 08/10/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 08/10/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/13/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/13/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/20/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/20/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/20/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/20/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/20/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/20/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/23/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/29/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/29/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/29/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/29/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/30/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/30/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/07/1994