Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/11/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 08/11/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 08/11/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 08/11/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/17/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/17/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/26/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 10/03/1994