Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/26/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/26/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/13/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/05/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/05/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/05/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 10/05/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/05/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/07/1994