Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/19/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/13/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/13/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/13/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/13/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/13/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/26/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/26/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/26/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/26/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/26/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/26/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/26/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 09/26/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/26/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/29/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/29/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/29/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/29/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/06/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/06/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 10/07/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/29/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 11/29/1994