Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 02/02/1993
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/02/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/02/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/02/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/02/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 02/02/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/02/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/02/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/02/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/02/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 02/02/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/02/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/02/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/02/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/02/1993
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/02/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 02/02/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/02/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/02/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/02/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/02/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 02/02/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/02/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/02/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 02/02/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 03/10/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/10/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/10/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/10/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/10/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/10/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/10/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/10/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/10/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/10/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/10/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/10/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/10/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 03/10/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/18/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/18/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/18/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/18/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/29/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/31/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/31/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/28/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/17/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 05/17/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/27/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/08/1993