Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 09/13/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/22/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/22/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/22/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/22/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/28/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/28/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/28/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/28/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/28/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/04/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/04/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/07/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/07/1994