There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bipartisan Health Care Reform Commission Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Bipartisan Health Care Reform Commission to analyze and make recommendations concerning health care reform.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/13/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date
10/05/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
10/03/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/03/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/19/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/15/1994Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
09/15/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
09/15/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
08/09/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7271-7272)
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/05/1994

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services09/13/1994 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel09/15/1994 Referred to
House Education and Labor09/13/1994 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations10/05/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/13/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/03/1994 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness10/03/1994 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service09/13/1994 Referred to
House Rules09/13/1994 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs09/13/1994 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care09/15/1994 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/13/1994 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/19/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5037.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5037. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/13/1994)

Bipartisan Health Care Reform Commission Act of 1994 - Establishes an independent Bipartisan Health Care Reform Commission to: (1) conduct an analysis of the health care systems of the States, as well as proposed or enacted reforms of such systems, and of the problems relating to Federal programs and policies relating to health care; (2) analyze private sector health systems; and (3) make recommendations on reforms that the Congress should consider in response to the findings of the analyses.

Directs the Commission to: (1) hold at least five public hearings; and (2) report to the Congress on the state of health care in the United States.

Sets forth provisions regarding procedures for congressional consideration of any recommendations of the Commission and review of any bill proposed by the Commission or an appropriate committee by the Director of the Congressional Budget Office.