Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/03/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/16/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/16/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/23/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/23/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/02/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/02/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/23/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/23/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/23/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/23/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/25/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/31/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/19/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/05/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/18/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/17/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/13/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/15/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/05/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/08/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/27/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/30/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/20/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/22/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/1994