Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/27/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 01/27/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/27/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/27/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/27/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/27/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/27/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/04/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/04/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/04/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/04/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/04/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/04/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/04/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/04/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/04/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/04/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/17/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/17/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/24/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/24/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 02/24/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/24/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/24/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/24/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/24/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/24/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/24/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/24/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/02/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/02/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/02/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/02/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/02/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/02/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/09/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/09/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/09/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/09/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/18/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 03/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/18/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/18/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/31/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/31/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/31/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/31/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/31/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/31/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/31/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/31/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/31/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/20/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/13/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/13/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/13/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/13/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/13/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 05/13/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/13/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/13/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/13/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/13/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/10/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 11/08/1993