Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 09/30/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/30/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/30/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/03/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/03/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/03/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/03/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/03/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/03/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/03/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/03/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/03/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/03/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/03/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/03/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 10/03/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/04/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/04/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/04/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/04/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/04/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/04/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/04/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/04/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 10/04/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/04/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 10/04/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/05/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/05/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/05/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/05/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/05/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 10/05/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/05/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/05/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/05/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/05/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/05/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 10/05/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/05/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/06/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/06/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 10/06/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/06/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/06/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/06/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/06/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 10/06/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/06/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/06/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/06/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/07/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/07/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/07/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/07/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/07/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/07/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/07/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 11/29/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 11/29/1994