Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 01/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/03/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/03/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/03/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 02/03/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/03/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/03/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/03/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/03/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/17/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/17/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/17/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/03/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/03/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/03/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/17/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/17/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/20/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/11/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/11/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/25/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 05/25/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/30/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/30/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/30/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/28/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/28/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/14/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/14/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/14/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/24/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/10/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 05/03/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/03/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/03/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/03/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/05/1994