Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/25/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/25/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/25/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/29/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/29/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/29/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/29/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/29/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/29/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/29/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/29/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/29/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 05/19/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/18/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/18/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/18/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/18/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/05/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 08/05/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/05/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 08/05/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/05/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 08/05/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/05/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/05/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/05/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/27/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/27/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/27/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/27/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/27/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/03/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/03/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/24/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/24/1994