Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/07/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/03/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/08/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/09/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/23/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/23/1994